MT SB563 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - (H) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - (H) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment establishing a mental health trust fund
Title
Constitutional amendment establishing a mental health trust fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-04 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 40 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-08 | House | (H) Died in Standing Committee |
2023-04-18 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Judiciary |
2023-04-17 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Judiciary |
2023-04-05 | House | (H) First Reading |
2023-04-05 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary |
2023-04-04 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2023-04-04 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2023-04-04 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2023-04-03 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2023-04-03 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2023-03-30 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2023-03-29 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2023-03-29 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2023-03-28 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2023-03-28 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2023-03-28 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2023-03-28 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2023-03-27 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2023-03-27 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-03-27 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2023-03-27 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-03-27 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2023-03-27 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2023-03-27 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2023-03-27 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2023-03-27 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2023-03-27 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review | |
2023-03-27 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2023-03-27 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2023-03-10 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2023-02-13 | (C) Draft Request Received |