MT SB55 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-27 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Clarify coverage of routine costs for patients in approved clinical trials

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clarify coverage of routine costs for patients in approved clinical trials

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-14 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-27 Chapter Number Assigned
2013-03-27Senate(S) Signed by Governor
2013-03-21Senate(S) Transmitted to Governor
2013-03-20House(H) Signed by Speaker
2013-03-19Senate(S) Signed by President
2013-03-18Senate(S) Returned from Enrolling
2013-03-18 (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available
2013-03-15Senate(S) Sent to Enrolling
2013-03-15House(H) Returned to Senate
2013-03-14House(H) 3rd Reading Concurred
2013-03-14House(H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2013-03-13House(H) 2nd Reading Concurred
2013-03-13House(H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2013-03-11 (C) Printed - New Version Available
2013-03-11 (C) Sponsors Engrossed
2013-03-11House(H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Human Services
2013-03-08House(H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Human Services
2013-03-08House(H) Hearing (H) Human Services
2013-02-26House(H) First Reading
2013-02-26House(H) Referred to Committee (H) Human Services
2013-01-26Senate(S) Transmitted to House
2013-01-25Senate(S) 3rd Reading Passed
2013-01-25Senate(S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2013-01-24Senate(S) 2nd Reading Passed
2013-01-24Senate(S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2013-01-22Senate(S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety
2013-01-21Senate(S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety
2013-01-16Senate(S) Sponsor List Modified
2013-01-16Senate(S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed
2013-01-14Senate(S) Hearing (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety
2013-01-08Senate(S) Fiscal Note Printed
2013-01-08Senate(S) Fiscal Note Signed
2013-01-08Senate(S) Fiscal Note Received
2013-01-07Senate(S) First Reading
2013-01-07Senate(S) Referred to Committee (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety
2012-12-14Senate(S) Fiscal Note Requested
2012-12-12 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
2012-12-12Senate(S) Introduced
2012-12-06 (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
2012-11-14 (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
2012-09-26 (C) Fiscal Note Probable
2012-09-26 (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
2012-09-26 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2012-09-20 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2012-09-20 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2012-09-17 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB]
2012-09-17 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2012-09-14 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2012-07-09 (C) Draft Request Received

Subjects


Montana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback