MT SB49 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Amend method for measuring water for aquifer recharge or mitigation
Title
Amend method for measuring water for aquifer recharge or mitigation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-15 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House (Y: 44 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-13 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 82 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 82 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - (H) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - (S) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-13 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 82 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 82 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - (H) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - (S) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2019-05-01 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2019-04-29 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2019-04-26 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-25 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2019-04-25 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2019-04-16 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2019-04-15 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2019-04-15 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House |
2019-04-15 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-04-13 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred |
2019-04-13 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-04-08 | House | (H) Returned to Senate with Amendments |
2019-04-08 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2019-04-08 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-04-05 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2019-04-05 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-04-04 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-04-04 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Natural Resources |
2019-04-03 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Natural Resources |
2019-04-03 | House | (H) Reconsidered Previous Action; Remains in Committee (H) Natural Resources |
2019-04-01 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Natural Resources |
2019-03-22 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Natural Resources |
2019-01-31 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Natural Resources |
2019-01-31 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Natural Resources |
2019-01-29 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2019-01-29 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2019-01-29 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-01-28 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2019-01-28 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-01-24 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-01-24 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Natural Resources |
2019-01-23 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Natural Resources |
2019-01-16 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Natural Resources |
2019-01-07 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2018-12-21 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Natural Resources |
2018-12-12 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2018-12-12 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2018-12-05 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2018-12-05 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2018-12-04 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2018-12-04 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2018-12-04 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2018-12-03 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2018-12-03 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2018-11-30 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2018-11-29 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2018-11-29 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2018-09-20 | (C) Draft Request Received |