MT SB418 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing transfers to implement provisions of House Bill 2
Title
Authorizing transfers to implement provisions of House Bill 2
Sponsors
Rep. Llew Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-24 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 36 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-24 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-24 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 89 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 92 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Not Concurred (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 86 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-18 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 88 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-17 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-28 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-24 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-24 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 89 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 92 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Not Concurred (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 86 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-18 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 88 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-17 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-28 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-05 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2015-05-05 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2015-04-28 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2015-04-28 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2015-04-27 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2015-04-27 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2015-04-27 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2015-04-27 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-04-25 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2015-04-24 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2015-04-24 | Senate | (S) On Motion Rules Suspended |
2015-04-24 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2015-04-24 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-04-24 | Senate | (S) Free Conference Committee Report Received (S) Free Conference |
2015-04-24 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2015-04-24 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-04-23 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2015-04-23 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-04-23 | House | (H) Free Conference Committee Report Received |
2015-04-23 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Free Conference |
2015-04-23 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Free Conference |
2015-04-21 | Senate | (S) Hearing Canceled (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-04-21 | House | (H) Free Conference Committee Appointed |
2015-04-21 | Senate | (S) Free Conference Committee Appointed (S) Free Conference |
2015-04-21 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Not Concurred |
2015-04-21 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-04-20 | House | (H) Returned to Senate with Amendments |
2015-04-20 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2015-04-20 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-04-18 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2015-04-18 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-04-17 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-04-17 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Appropriations |
2015-04-17 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Appropriations |
2015-04-13 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2015-04-01 | House | (H) First Reading |
2015-04-01 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2015-03-31 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2015-03-30 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2015-03-30 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-03-28 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2015-03-28 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-03-26 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-03-26 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-03-26 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-03-25 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-03-25 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2015-03-24 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2015-03-24 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2015-03-24 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2015-03-24 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2015-03-24 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2015-03-24 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2015-03-24 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2015-03-24 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2015-03-24 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN] | |
2015-03-23 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2015-03-23 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2015-03-23 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2014-12-08 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2014-12-05 | (C) Draft Request Received |