MT SB405 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-29 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Creating the Healthy Montana Act to Expand Health Care Coverage

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating the Healthy Montana Act to Expand Health Care Coverage

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-18 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-17 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-11 - House of Representatives - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 54 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - House of Representatives - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended (Y: 54 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - House of Representatives - (H) Human Services Committee Executive Action--Bill Not Concurred as Amended (Y: 10 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-29 Chapter Number Assigned
2015-04-29Senate(S) Signed by Governor
2015-04-22Senate(S) Transmitted to Governor
2015-04-21House(H) Signed by Speaker
2015-04-21Senate(S) Signed by President
2015-04-20Senate(S) Returned from Enrolling
2015-04-20 (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available
2015-04-18Senate(S) Sent to Enrolling
2015-04-18Senate(S) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House
2015-04-18Senate(S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2015-04-17Senate(S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred
2015-04-17Senate(S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2015-04-13House(H) Returned to Senate with Amendments
2015-04-11House(H) 3rd Reading Concurred
2015-04-11House(H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2015-04-10House(H) Motion to Reconsider Failed
2015-04-10House(H) Motion Failed
2015-04-09 (C) Printed - New Version Available
2015-04-09House(H) Motion Failed
2015-04-09House(H) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended
2015-04-09House(H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed
2015-04-09House(H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed
2015-04-09House(H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed
2015-04-09House(H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed
2015-04-09House(H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried
2015-04-09House(H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2015-04-08House(H) Taken from Committee; Placed on 2nd Reading (H) Human Services
2015-04-07House(H) Committee Report--Bill Not Concurred as Amended (H) Human Services
2015-04-07House(H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Not Concurred as Amended (H) Human Services
2015-04-07House(H) Hearing (H) Human Services
2015-04-01House(H) First Reading
2015-04-01House(H) Referred to Committee (H) Human Services
2015-03-31Senate(S) Transmitted to House
2015-03-30Senate(S) 3rd Reading Passed
2015-03-30Senate(S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2015-03-27 (C) Printed - New Version Available
2015-03-27Senate(S) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended
2015-03-27Senate(S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed
2015-03-27Senate(S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed
2015-03-27Senate(S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed
2015-03-27Senate(S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed
2015-03-27Senate(S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried
2015-03-27Senate(S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2015-03-26Senate(S) Taken from Committee; Placed on 2nd Reading (S) Finance and Claims
2015-03-25Senate(S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims
2015-03-24Senate(S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims
2015-03-23Senate(S) Fiscal Note Printed
2015-03-20Senate(S) Hearing (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety
2015-03-20Senate(S) Fiscal Note Signed
2015-03-20Senate(S) Fiscal Note Received
2015-03-17 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
2015-03-17Senate(S) Referred to Committee (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety
2015-03-17Senate(S) First Reading
2015-03-17Senate(S) Fiscal Note Requested
2015-03-17Senate(S) Introduced
2015-03-17 (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
2015-03-17 (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
2015-03-17 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2015-03-17 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2015-03-17 (C) Draft Back for Redo
2015-03-17 (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
2015-03-17 (C) Fiscal Note Probable
2015-03-17 (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
2015-03-16 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2015-03-16 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH]
2015-03-16 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2015-03-16 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2015-03-16 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2015-03-16 (C) Draft Back for Redo
2015-03-16 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2015-03-16 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2015-03-16 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2015-03-14 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2015-03-14 (C) Draft Back for Redo
2015-03-13 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2015-03-13 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2015-03-10 (C) Draft Taken Off Hold
2015-01-20 (C) Draft On Hold
2014-11-26 (C) Draft Request Received

Subjects


Montana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=405&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=SB&Z_ACTION=Find&P_SESS=20151
Texthttp://leg.mt.gov/bills/2015/sb0499/SB0405_1.pdf
Texthttp://leg.mt.gov/bills/2015/sb0499/SB0405_2.pdf
Texthttp://leg.mt.gov/bills/2015/sb0499/SB0405_3.pdf
Texthttp://leg.mt.gov/bills/2015/sb0499/SB0405_x.pdf
Roll Callhttp://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=S1225&P_SESS=20151
Roll Callhttp://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=S1313&P_SESS=20151
Roll Callhttp://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=H1538&P_SESS=20151
Roll Callhttp://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=H1644&P_SESS=20151
Roll Callhttp://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=S1619&P_SESS=20151
Roll Callhttp://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=S1650&P_SESS=20151
Roll Callhttp://leg.mt.gov/bills/2015/minutes/house/votesheets/SB0405HUH150407.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback