MT SB401 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-10 - (S) Veto Override Failed in Legislature
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-10 - (S) Veto Override Failed in Legislature
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise disposition of metalliferous mines license tax
Title
Revise disposition of metalliferous mines license tax
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Sesso [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-17 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 93 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 93 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - (H) Rules Suspended to Accept Late Transmittal of Bill (Y: 92 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-06 - Senate - (S) Reconsidered Previous Action; Remains in 3rd Reading Process (Y: 26 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Failed (Y: 9 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
2013-04-04 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 93 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - (H) Rules Suspended to Accept Late Transmittal of Bill (Y: 92 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-06 - Senate - (S) Reconsidered Previous Action; Remains in 3rd Reading Process (Y: 26 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Failed (Y: 9 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
2013-04-04 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-10 | Senate | (S) Veto Override Failed in Legislature |
2013-05-10 | Senate | (S) Veto Override Vote Mail Poll in Progress |
2013-05-06 | Senate | (S) Veto Override Vote Mail Poll Letter Being Prepared |
2013-05-06 | Senate | (S) Vetoed by Governor |
2013-04-26 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2013-04-25 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2013-04-23 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2013-04-18 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2013-04-18 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2013-04-18 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2013-04-17 | House | (H) Returned to Senate |
2013-04-17 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2013-04-17 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-04-16 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2013-04-16 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-04-13 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Appropriations |
2013-04-12 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Appropriations |
2013-04-12 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2013-04-10 | House | (H) First Reading |
2013-04-10 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2013-04-09 | House | (H) Rules Suspended to Accept Late Transmittal of Bill |
2013-04-08 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2013-04-08 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2013-04-08 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-04-06 | Senate | (S) Reconsidered Previous Action; Remains in 3rd Reading Process |
2013-04-05 | Senate | (S) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal |
2013-04-05 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Failed |
2013-04-05 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-04-04 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2013-04-04 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2013-04-04 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-04-03 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed Consideration |
2013-04-03 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-04-02 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2013-03-28 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Natural Resources |
2013-03-28 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2013-03-27 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Natural Resources |
2013-03-27 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2013-03-25 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Natural Resources |
2013-03-22 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2013-03-22 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Natural Resources |
2013-03-22 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2013-03-22 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2013-03-21 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2013-03-21 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2013-03-20 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2013-03-20 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2013-03-20 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2013-03-20 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2013-03-19 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2013-03-18 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2013-03-16 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2013-03-16 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2013-03-16 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2012-12-13 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2012-12-12 | (C) Draft Request Received |