MT SB395 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-16 - (H) 2nd Reading Not Concurred
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Revise laws related to youth hunting

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise laws related to youth hunting

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-16 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Not Concurred (Y: 49 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-08 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 25 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - (S) Fish and Game Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-16House(H) 2nd Reading Not Concurred
2015-04-16House(H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2015-04-08House(H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Judiciary
2015-04-08House(H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Judiciary
2015-04-08House(H) Hearing (H) Judiciary
2015-04-01House(H) First Reading
2015-04-01House(H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary
2015-03-31Senate(S) Transmitted to House
2015-03-31Senate(S) 3rd Reading Passed
2015-03-31Senate(S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2015-03-30Senate(S) 2nd Reading Passed
2015-03-30Senate(S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2015-03-28Senate(S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Finance and Claims
2015-03-27Senate(S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Finance and Claims
2015-03-27Senate(S) Revised Fiscal Note Signed
2015-03-27Senate(S) Revised Fiscal Note Received
2015-03-27Senate(S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims
2015-03-26Senate(S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims
2015-03-25Senate(S) Revised Fiscal Note Requested
2015-03-25 (C) Printed - New Version Available
2015-03-25Senate(S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Fish and Game
2015-03-24Senate(S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Fish and Game
2015-03-19Senate(S) Committee Vote Failed; Remains in Committee (S) Fish and Game
2015-03-17Senate(S) Hearing (S) Fish and Game
2015-03-17Senate(S) Fiscal Note Printed
2015-03-17Senate(S) Fiscal Note Signed
2015-03-16Senate(S) Fiscal Note Received
2015-03-11 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
2015-03-11Senate(S) Referred to Committee (S) Fish and Game
2015-03-11Senate(S) First Reading
2015-03-11Senate(S) Fiscal Note Requested
2015-03-11Senate(S) Introduced
2015-03-10 (C) Draft Delivered to Requester
2015-03-10 (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
2015-03-10 (C) Fiscal Note Probable
2015-03-10 (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
2015-03-10 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2015-03-09 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2015-03-09 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2015-03-09 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH]
2015-03-06 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2015-03-06 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2015-03-06 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2015-03-05 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2015-03-05 (C) Draft Taken Off Hold
2015-01-19 (C) Draft On Hold
2014-11-13 (C) Draft Request Received

Subjects


Montana State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback