MT SB395 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Revise health care laws to expand Medicaid and improve health care delivery
Title
Revise health care laws to expand Medicaid and improve health care delivery
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-04 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 26 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 26 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Senate - (S) Adverse Committee Report Rejected (Y: 23 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-02 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 26 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Senate - (S) Adverse Committee Report Rejected (Y: 23 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | House | (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Human Services |
2013-04-17 | House | (H) Committee Vote Failed; Remains in Committee (H) Human Services |
2013-04-16 | House | (H) Motion Failed |
2013-04-15 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Human Services |
2013-04-06 | House | (H) First Reading |
2013-04-06 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Human Services |
2013-04-05 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2013-04-04 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2013-04-04 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-04-03 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-04-02 | Senate | (S) Motion Failed |
2013-04-02 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended |
2013-04-02 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried |
2013-04-02 | Senate | (S) Motion Failed |
2013-04-02 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-04-02 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-04-02 | Senate | (S) Adverse Committee Report Rejected (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2013-04-02 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Not Passed as Amended (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2013-03-27 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Not Passed as Amended (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2013-03-27 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2013-03-27 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2013-03-27 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2013-03-21 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2013-03-21 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2013-03-20 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2013-03-20 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2013-03-19 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2013-03-19 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2013-03-19 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2013-03-19 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2013-03-19 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2013-03-19 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2013-03-19 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2013-03-18 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB] | |
2013-03-18 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2013-03-18 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2013-03-16 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2013-02-15 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2013-01-28 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2013-01-19 | (C) Draft Request Received |