MT SB384 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-24 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-24 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Court authorization required for notices of no contact between landlord & tenant
Title
Court authorization required for notices of no contact between landlord & tenant
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Webb [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-11 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 55 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 59 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-20 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 59 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-20 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-24 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2015-04-24 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2015-04-17 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2015-04-16 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2015-04-15 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2015-04-14 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2015-04-14 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2015-04-13 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2015-04-11 | House | (H) Returned to Senate |
2015-04-11 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2015-04-11 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-04-10 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2015-04-10 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-03-20 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Judiciary |
2015-03-20 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Judiciary |
2015-03-17 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Judiciary |
2015-03-05 | House | (H) First Reading |
2015-03-05 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary |
2015-02-26 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2015-02-26 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2015-02-26 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-02-26 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2015-02-26 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-02-24 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-02-24 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Judiciary |
2015-02-24 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Judiciary |
2015-02-24 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Judiciary |
2015-02-20 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2015-02-20 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Judiciary |
2015-02-20 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2015-02-20 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2015-02-20 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2015-02-18 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2015-02-18 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2015-02-18 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2015-02-18 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2015-02-18 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2015-02-18 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK] | |
2015-02-18 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2015-02-17 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2015-02-17 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2014-12-23 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2014-11-28 | (C) Draft Request Received |