MT SB376 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise lodging facility use tax to construct MHC
Title
Revise lodging facility use tax to construct MHC
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-31 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 26 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 26 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-28 | House | (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Appropriations |
2017-04-12 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Appropriations |
2017-04-07 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2017-04-01 | House | (H) First Reading |
2017-04-01 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2017-03-31 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2017-03-31 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2017-03-31 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-03-30 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2017-03-30 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-03-30 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2017-03-29 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Finance and Claims |
2017-03-29 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Finance and Claims |
2017-03-29 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Signed |
2017-03-29 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2017-03-29 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2017-03-25 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2017-03-25 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2017-03-24 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2017-03-24 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2017-03-24 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2017-03-24 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2017-03-24 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2017-03-24 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2017-03-24 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2017-03-24 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2017-03-24 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2017-03-24 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2017-03-23 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2017-03-23 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH] | |
2017-03-23 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2017-03-23 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2017-03-23 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2017-03-22 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2017-01-03 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2016-11-14 | (C) Draft Request Received |