MT SB374 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise laws related to utility line extensions
Title
Revise laws related to utility line extensions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 86 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 93 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-22 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 74 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-21 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended (Y: 73 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - (H) Energy, Technology, and Federal Relations Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - (S) Energy and Telecommunications Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 93 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-22 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 74 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-21 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended (Y: 73 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - (H) Energy, Technology, and Federal Relations Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - (S) Energy and Telecommunications Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-22 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2017-05-22 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2017-05-17 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2017-05-10 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2017-05-04 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2017-04-28 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2017-04-28 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2017-04-27 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-04-27 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2017-04-27 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2017-04-27 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-04-26 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2017-04-26 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2017-04-26 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2017-04-26 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | (S) Conference Committee Report Received (S) Conference |
2017-04-26 | House | (H) Conference Committee Report Received |
2017-04-26 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Conference |
2017-04-25 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Conference |
2017-04-24 | House | (H) Conference Committee Appointed (H) Conference |
2017-04-24 | Senate | (S) Conference Committee Appointed (S) Conference |
2017-04-24 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Not Concurred |
2017-04-24 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-04-24 | Senate | (S) Rules Suspended to Accept Late Return of Amended Bill |
2017-04-22 | House | (H) Returned to Senate with Amendments |
2017-04-22 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2017-04-22 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-04-21 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-04-21 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended |
2017-04-21 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried |
2017-04-21 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-04-11 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Energy, Technology, and Federal Relations |
2017-04-10 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Energy, Technology, and Federal Relations |
2017-04-10 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Energy, Technology, and Federal Relations |
2017-04-03 | House | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) Energy, Technology, and Federal Relations |
2017-04-01 | House | (H) First Reading |
2017-04-01 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Energy, Technology, and Federal Relations |
2017-03-31 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2017-03-31 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2017-03-31 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-03-30 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2017-03-30 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-03-29 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2017-03-29 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Energy and Telecommunications |
2017-03-29 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Signed |
2017-03-29 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-03-29 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2017-03-28 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Energy and Telecommunications |
2017-03-28 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Energy and Telecommunications |
2017-03-24 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2017-03-24 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Energy and Telecommunications |
2017-03-24 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2017-03-24 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2017-03-24 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2017-03-23 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2017-03-23 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2017-03-23 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2017-03-23 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2017-03-23 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2017-03-23 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2017-03-23 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2017-03-22 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2017-03-22 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH] | |
2017-03-22 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2017-03-21 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2017-03-21 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2017-03-20 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2017-03-20 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2016-11-16 | (C) Draft Request Received |