MT SB365 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Generally revise and reorganize driving under the influence laws
Title
Generally revise and reorganize driving under the influence laws
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-27 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-27 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2021-05-12 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2021-05-04 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2021-05-04 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2021-05-04 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2021-04-26 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2021-04-26 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2021-04-21 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2021-04-20 | House | (H) Returned to Senate |
2021-04-20 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2021-04-20 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-04-15 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2021-04-15 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-04-14 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Judiciary |
2021-04-14 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Judiciary |
2021-03-19 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Judiciary |
2021-03-08 | House | (H) First Reading |
2021-03-08 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary |
2021-03-02 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2021-03-02 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2021-03-02 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2021-03-01 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-03-01 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2021-03-01 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-03-01 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Judiciary |
2021-02-27 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Judiciary |
2021-02-27 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2021-02-27 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Judiciary |
2021-02-24 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Judiciary |
2021-02-24 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2021-02-24 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2021-02-24 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2021-02-23 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2021-02-23 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2021-02-23 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-02-23 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2021-02-23 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-02-23 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2021-02-22 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2021-02-22 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2021-02-22 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2021-02-18 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2021-02-16 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2021-02-13 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2021-02-12 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2021-02-08 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2020-11-13 | (C) Draft Request Received |