MT SB359 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for property tax incentives for qualified data centers
Title
Providing for property tax incentives for qualified data centers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-26 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 91 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Not Concurred (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 69 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 73 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - (H) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 40 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - (S) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Not Concurred (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 69 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 73 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - (H) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 40 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - (S) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-22 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2017-05-22 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2017-05-17 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2017-05-10 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2017-05-04 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2017-04-28 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2017-04-27 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2017-04-27 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-04-27 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2017-04-26 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2017-04-26 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2017-04-26 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-04-26 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-04-25 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2017-04-25 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-04-25 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2017-04-25 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-04-24 | Senate | (S) Free Conference Committee Report Received (S) Free Conference |
2017-04-24 | House | (H) Free Conference Committee Report Received |
2017-04-24 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Free Conference |
2017-04-24 | House | (H) Free Conference Committee Appointed (H) Free Conference |
2017-04-24 | Senate | (S) Free Conference Committee Appointed (S) Free Conference |
2017-04-24 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Not Concurred |
2017-04-24 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-04-18 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed Consideration |
2017-04-18 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-04-13 | House | (H) Returned to Senate with Amendments |
2017-04-13 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2017-04-13 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-04-12 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2017-04-12 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-04-11 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-04-11 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Taxation |
2017-04-11 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Taxation |
2017-04-06 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Taxation |
2017-04-01 | House | (H) First Reading |
2017-04-01 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Taxation |
2017-03-30 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2017-03-30 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2017-03-30 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2017-03-30 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-03-28 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-03-28 | (C) Sponsors Engrossed | |
2017-03-28 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Taxation |
2017-03-28 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Taxation |
2017-03-27 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2017-03-27 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Signed |
2017-03-27 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2017-03-24 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Taxation |
2017-03-21 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Taxation |
2017-03-21 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2017-03-20 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2017-03-20 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2017-03-20 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2017-03-20 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2017-03-20 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2017-03-18 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2017-03-17 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2017-03-17 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2017-03-17 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2017-03-17 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2017-03-17 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2017-03-17 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2017-03-16 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2017-03-16 | (C) Draft Back for Redo | |
2017-03-16 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2017-03-16 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2017-03-16 | (C) Draft Back for Redo | |
2017-03-16 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2017-03-16 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2017-03-15 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2017-03-15 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2017-03-15 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2016-12-06 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2016-04-26 | (C) Draft Request Received |
Subjects
Communications
Economic Development
Information Technology
Revenue, Local
Revenue, State
Taxation (Generally)
Taxation--Property
Economic Development
Information Technology
Revenue, Local
Revenue, State
Taxation (Generally)
Taxation--Property