MT SB351 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 16 2023 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-30 - (S) Transmitted to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 16 2023 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-30 - (S) Transmitted to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Generally revise privacy laws related to biometric data
Title
Generally revise privacy laws related to biometric data
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-02 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Not Concurred (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-14 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-07 - House - (H) Energy, Technology and Federal Relations Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Senate - (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Not Concurred (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-14 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-07 - House - (H) Energy, Technology and Federal Relations Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Senate - (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-30 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2023-05-23 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2023-05-16 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2023-05-16 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2023-05-16 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2023-05-16 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2023-05-02 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2023-05-02 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2023-05-02 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2023-05-02 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2023-05-02 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2023-05-02 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2023-05-02 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2023-05-01 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2023-05-01 | House | (H) Free Conference Committee Report Received |
2023-05-01 | Senate | (S) Free Conference Committee Report Received |
2023-04-26 | House | (H) Free Conference Committee Appointed |
2023-04-24 | Senate | (S) Free Conference Committee Appointed |
2023-04-24 | Senate | (S) Conference Committee Dissolved |
2023-04-21 | Senate | (S) Conference Committee Appointed |
2023-04-20 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Not Concurred |
2023-04-20 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2023-04-18 | House | (H) Returned to Senate with Amendments |
2023-04-17 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2023-04-14 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2023-04-13 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Energy, Technology and Federal Relations |
2023-04-13 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2023-04-07 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Energy, Technology and Federal Relations |
2023-04-05 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Energy, Technology and Federal Relations |
2023-03-15 | House | (H) First Reading |
2023-03-15 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Energy, Technology and Federal Relations |
2023-03-03 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2023-03-02 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2023-03-02 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2023-03-01 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2023-03-01 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2023-02-25 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2023-02-24 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2023-02-24 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2023-02-24 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2023-02-23 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2023-02-15 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2023-02-15 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2023-02-15 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2023-02-15 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2023-02-15 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2023-02-14 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-02-14 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2023-02-14 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-02-14 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2023-01-30 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2023-01-30 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2023-01-29 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2023-01-29 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2023-01-28 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2023-01-25 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review | |
2023-01-18 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2023-01-18 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2023-01-18 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2023-01-17 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2023-01-13 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2023-01-03 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2023-01-02 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2022-11-23 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2022-11-13 | (C) Draft Request Received |