MT SB34 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-23 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-23 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Facilitate cabin and home-site sales
Title
Facilitate cabin and home-site sales
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-11 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 81 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 84 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - (H) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - (S) Rereferred to Committee (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - (S) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 84 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - (H) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - (S) Rereferred to Committee (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - (S) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-23 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2015-04-23 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2015-04-17 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2015-04-16 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2015-04-15 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2015-04-13 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2015-04-13 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2015-04-13 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2015-04-11 | House | (H) Returned to Senate |
2015-04-11 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2015-04-11 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-04-10 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Appropriations |
2015-04-10 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Appropriations |
2015-04-10 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2015-04-09 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2015-04-09 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2015-04-09 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-03-26 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Natural Resources |
2015-03-25 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Natural Resources |
2015-03-13 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Natural Resources |
2015-02-20 | House | (H) First Reading |
2015-02-20 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Natural Resources |
2015-02-18 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2015-02-18 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2015-02-18 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-02-17 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2015-02-17 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-02-11 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-02-10 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-02-05 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-01-28 | Senate | (S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-01-28 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2015-01-28 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-01-24 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Natural Resources |
2015-01-23 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Natural Resources |
2015-01-14 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Natural Resources |
2015-01-12 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-01-12 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Signed |
2015-01-12 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2015-01-09 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-01-08 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Signed |
2015-01-08 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2015-01-05 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2014-12-12 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Natural Resources |
2014-12-10 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2014-12-04 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2014-12-04 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2014-11-26 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2014-11-26 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2014-11-25 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2014-11-21 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2014-11-21 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2014-11-21 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN] | |
2014-11-20 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2014-11-20 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2014-11-14 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2014-09-18 | (C) Draft Request Received |