MT SB337 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise income tax credit for alternative energy generation
Title
Revise income tax credit for alternative energy generation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-15 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 93 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-13 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 93 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - (H) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-23 - Senate - (S) Energy and Telecommunications Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-13 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 93 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - (H) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-23 - Senate - (S) Energy and Telecommunications Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2019-05-07 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2019-04-29 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2019-04-26 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-24 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2019-04-16 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2019-04-16 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2019-04-15 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2019-04-15 | House | (H) Returned to Senate |
2019-04-15 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2019-04-15 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-04-13 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2019-04-13 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-04-11 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Taxation |
2019-04-11 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Taxation |
2019-04-10 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Taxation |
2019-04-04 | House | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) Taxation |
2019-04-02 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Taxation |
2019-04-02 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Taxation |
2019-03-29 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2019-03-29 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2019-03-29 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-03-28 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-03-25 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Energy and Telecommunications |
2019-03-23 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Energy and Telecommunications |
2019-03-23 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Energy and Telecommunications |
2019-03-22 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2019-03-22 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Signed |
2019-03-22 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2019-03-19 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Energy and Telecommunications |
2019-03-18 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2019-03-15 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2019-03-15 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2019-03-15 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2019-03-15 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2019-03-14 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2019-03-14 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2019-03-14 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2019-03-14 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH] | |
2019-03-14 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2019-03-13 | (C) Draft Back for Redo | |
2019-02-27 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2019-02-27 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2019-02-26 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2019-02-26 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2019-02-26 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2019-02-26 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2019-02-26 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2019-02-26 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH] | |
2019-02-19 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2019-02-19 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2019-02-19 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2019-02-14 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2018-12-01 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2018-11-13 | (C) Draft Request Received |