MT SB303 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise Montana veteran home loan program laws

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise Montana veteran home loan program laws

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-21 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 91 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 88 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - House - (H) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - (S) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-22 Chapter Number Assigned
2017-05-22Senate(S) Signed by Governor
2017-05-17Senate(S) Transmitted to Governor
2017-05-10House(H) Signed by Speaker
2017-04-28Senate(S) Signed by President
2017-04-24Senate(S) Returned from Enrolling
2017-04-24 (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available
2017-04-24Senate(S) Sent to Enrolling
2017-04-21House(H) Returned to Senate
2017-04-21House(H) 3rd Reading Concurred
2017-04-21House(H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2017-04-20House(H) 2nd Reading Concurred
2017-04-20House(H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2017-03-24House(H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) State Administration
2017-03-24House(H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) State Administration
2017-03-21House(H) Hearing (H) State Administration
2017-03-09House(H) Hearing Canceled (H) State Administration
2017-03-01House(H) First Reading
2017-03-01House(H) Referred to Committee (H) State Administration
2017-02-24Senate(S) Transmitted to House
2017-02-24Senate(S) 3rd Reading Passed
2017-02-24Senate(S) On Motion Rules Suspended
2017-02-24Senate(S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2017-02-24Senate(S) 2nd Reading Passed
2017-02-24Senate(S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2017-02-23Senate(S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) State Administration
2017-02-23Senate(S) Fiscal Note Printed
2017-02-22Senate(S) Fiscal Note Signed
2017-02-22Senate(S) Fiscal Note Received
2017-02-22Senate(S) Hearing (S) State Administration
2017-02-22Senate(S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) State Administration
2017-02-18Senate(S) Referred to Committee (S) State Administration
2017-02-18Senate(S) First Reading
2017-02-17 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
2017-02-17Senate(S) Fiscal Note Requested
2017-02-17Senate(S) Introduced
2017-02-17 (C) Draft Delivered to Requester
2017-02-17 (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
2017-02-16 (C) Executive Director Final Review
2017-02-16 (C) Draft in Assembly
2017-02-16 (C) Executive Director Review
2017-02-16 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2017-02-16 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2017-02-16 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2017-02-16 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
2017-02-15 (C) Draft in Edit
2017-02-15 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2017-02-15 (C) Fiscal Note Probable
2017-02-15 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2016-04-13 (C) Draft Request Received

Subjects


Montana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=303&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=SB&Z_ACTION=Find&P_SESS=20171
Texthttp://leg.mt.gov/bills/2017/sb0399/SB0303_1.pdf
Texthttp://leg.mt.gov/bills/2017/sb0399/SB0303_x.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.mt.gov/bills/2017/minutes/senate/votesheets/SB0303STS170222.pdf
Roll Callhttp://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=S643&P_SESS=20171
Roll Callhttp://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=S707&P_SESS=20171
Roll Callhttp://leg.mt.gov/bills/2017/minutes/house/votesheets/SB0303STH170324.pdf
Roll Callhttp://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=H1752&P_SESS=20171
Roll Callhttp://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=H1838&P_SESS=20171

Bill Comments

feedback