MT SB296 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provide protections for physician treatment of Lyme disease

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide protections for physician treatment of Lyme disease

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-25 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-23 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-24House(H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Human Services
2013-03-23House(H) Tabled in Committee (H) Human Services
2013-03-18House(H) Hearing (H) Human Services
2013-02-27House(H) First Reading
2013-02-27House(H) Referred to Committee (H) Human Services
2013-02-26Senate(S) Transmitted to House
2013-02-25Senate(S) 3rd Reading Passed
2013-02-25Senate(S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2013-02-23Senate(S) 2nd Reading Passed
2013-02-23Senate(S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2013-02-21Senate(S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety
2013-02-20Senate(S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety
2013-02-18Senate(S) Hearing (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety
2013-02-12Senate(S) Referred to Committee (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety
2013-02-12Senate(S) First Reading
2013-02-12 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
2013-02-11Senate(S) Introduced
2013-02-11 (C) Draft Delivered to Requester
2013-02-08 (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
2013-02-08 (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
2013-02-08 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2013-02-07 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2013-02-07 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2013-02-07 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB]
2013-02-06 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2013-02-06 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2013-02-05 (C) Draft Back for Redo
2013-01-24 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2013-01-23 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2012-12-13 (C) Draft Request Received

Subjects


Montana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback