MT SB291 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - (S) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - (S) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise laws on use of seatbelts and child safety restraints; primary enforcement
Title
Revise laws on use of seatbelts and child safety restraints; primary enforcement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | Senate | (S) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal |
2015-03-30 | Senate | (S) Motion Failed (S) Judiciary |
2015-03-27 | Senate | (S) Motion Failed (S) Judiciary |
2015-02-25 | Senate | (S) Motion Failed (S) Judiciary |
2015-02-18 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Judiciary |
2015-02-17 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Judiciary |
2015-02-17 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-02-16 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Signed |
2015-02-16 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2015-02-09 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2015-02-09 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Judiciary |
2015-02-09 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2015-02-09 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-02-09 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2015-02-06 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2015-02-05 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2015-02-05 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2015-02-05 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2015-02-04 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2015-02-04 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2015-02-04 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2015-02-04 | (C) Draft Back for Redo | |
2015-01-13 | (C) Draft Taken by Drafter | |
2015-01-12 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2015-01-09 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2015-01-09 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2015-01-09 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2015-01-08 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2015-01-08 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2015-01-07 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2014-12-30 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2014-12-12 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2014-12-01 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2014-12-01 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2013-06-18 | (C) Draft Request Received |
Subjects
Montana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=291&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=SB&Z_ACTION=Find&P_SESS=20151 |
Text | https://leg.mt.gov/bills/2015/sb0299/SB0291_1.pdf |