MT SB29 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-13 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-13 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Mandatory alcohol server and sales training
Title
Mandatory alcohol server and sales training
Sponsors
Sen. Lynda Moss [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-28 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-08 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred (Y: 27 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Not Concur Motion Failed (Y: 21 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-04-05 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 56 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 62 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-12 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 25 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 27 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-08 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred (Y: 27 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Not Concur Motion Failed (Y: 21 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-04-05 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 56 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 62 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-12 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 25 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 27 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-13 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2011-05-04 | (S) Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-28 | (H) Returned to Senate Not Concurred in Governor's Proposed Amendments | |
2011-04-28 | (H) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopt Motion Failed | |
2011-04-28 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-04-28 | (S) Transmitted to House for Consideration of Governor's Proposed Amendments | |
2011-04-28 | (S) 3rd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted | |
2011-04-28 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-04-28 | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading | |
2011-04-28 | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading | |
2011-04-27 | (S) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted | |
2011-04-27 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-04-26 | (S) Returned with Governor's Proposed Amendments | |
2011-04-20 | (S) Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-20 | (H) Signed by Speaker | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Signed by President | |
2011-04-11 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2011-04-11 | (S) Returned from Enrolling | |
2011-04-08 | (S) Sent to Enrolling | |
2011-04-08 | (S) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House | |
2011-04-08 | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading | |
2011-04-07 | (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred | |
2011-04-07 | (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Not Concur Motion Failed | |
2011-04-07 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-04-05 | (H) Returned to Senate with Amendments | |
2011-04-05 | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred | |
2011-04-05 | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading | |
2011-04-04 | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred | |
2011-04-04 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-03-25 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2011-03-25 | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Business and Labor | |
2011-03-23 | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Business and Labor | |
2011-03-14 | (C) Sponsors Engrossed | |
2011-03-11 | (H) Hearing (H) Business and Labor | |
2011-02-22 | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Business and Labor | |
2011-02-22 | (H) First Reading | |
2011-02-12 | (S) Transmitted to House | |
2011-02-12 | (S) 3rd Reading Passed | |
2011-02-12 | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading | |
2011-02-11 | (S) 2nd Reading Passed | |
2011-02-11 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-02-09 | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed | |
2011-02-09 | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Received | |
2011-02-09 | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Signed | |
2011-01-31 | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Requested | |
2011-01-28 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2011-01-28 | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs | |
2011-01-28 | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Scheduled for Executive Action (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs | |
2011-01-25 | (S) Hearing (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs | |
2011-01-19 | (S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs | |
2011-01-07 | (S) Fiscal Note Printed | |
2011-01-05 | (S) Fiscal Note Received | |
2011-01-03 | (S) First Reading | |
2010-12-14 | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Judiciary | |
2010-12-09 | (S) Fiscal Note Requested | |
2010-12-02 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2010-12-02 | (S) Introduced | |
2010-11-23 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2010-11-16 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2010-11-15 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2010-11-15 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2010-11-10 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2010-11-08 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2010-11-08 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2010-11-03 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2010-09-20 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2010-09-20 | (C) Draft Back for Redo | |
2010-09-20 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2010-09-20 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2010-09-14 | (C) Draft Request Received |