MT SB271 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - (H) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - (H) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revising elements of the budgeting process for the PSC
Title
Revising elements of the budgeting process for the PSC
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-19 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | (H) Died in Standing Committee | |
2011-04-19 | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Appropriations | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations | |
2011-03-03 | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Appropriations | |
2011-03-03 | (H) First Reading | |
2011-02-19 | (S) Transmitted to House | |
2011-02-19 | (S) 3rd Reading Passed | |
2011-02-19 | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading | |
2011-02-18 | (S) 2nd Reading Passed | |
2011-02-18 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-02-16 | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Finance and Claims | |
2011-02-15 | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Finance and Claims | |
2011-02-15 | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims | |
2011-02-14 | (S) Fiscal Note Printed | |
2011-02-11 | (S) Fiscal Note Received | |
2011-02-07 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2011-02-05 | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims | |
2011-02-05 | (S) First Reading | |
2011-02-05 | (S) Fiscal Note Requested | |
2011-02-05 | (S) Introduced | |
2011-02-03 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2011-02-03 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2011-02-02 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2011-02-02 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2011-02-02 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2011-02-02 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2011-02-02 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2011-01-31 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2011-01-29 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2011-01-29 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2011-01-06 | (C) Draft Request Received |