MT SB270 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Revise reimbursement conditions for certain pharmacies, pharmacists
Title
Revise reimbursement conditions for certain pharmacies, pharmacists
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - (H) Business and Labor Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - (H) Business and Labor Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2019-05-02 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2019-04-26 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2019-04-18 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-15 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2019-04-08 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2019-04-05 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2019-04-03 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2019-04-03 | House | (H) Returned to Senate |
2019-04-03 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2019-04-03 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-04-02 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2019-04-02 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-03-25 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Business and Labor |
2019-03-25 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Business and Labor |
2019-03-25 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Business and Labor |
2019-03-11 | House | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) Business and Labor |
2019-02-28 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Business and Labor |
2019-02-28 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Business and Labor |
2019-02-26 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2019-02-26 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2019-02-26 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-02-25 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2019-02-25 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-02-21 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-02-21 | (C) Sponsors Engrossed | |
2019-02-21 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2019-02-21 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2019-02-19 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2019-02-15 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2019-02-15 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2019-02-15 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2019-02-13 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2019-02-06 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2019-02-06 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2019-02-06 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2019-02-06 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2019-02-06 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2019-02-06 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2019-02-06 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2019-02-06 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2019-02-06 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2019-02-05 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2019-02-05 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2019-01-29 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2019-01-09 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2018-11-29 | (C) Draft Request Received |