MT SB246 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-22 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-22 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise corporate income tax water's-edge election laws
Title
Revise corporate income tax water's-edge election laws
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-24 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 75 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 77 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-14 - House - (H) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 33 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - (S) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 77 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-14 - House - (H) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 33 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - (S) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-22 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2023-05-22 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2023-05-12 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2023-05-11 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2023-05-04 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2023-04-27 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2023-04-27 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2023-04-24 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2023-04-24 | House | (H) Returned to Senate |
2023-04-24 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2023-04-24 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2023-04-21 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Appropriations |
2023-04-20 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Appropriations |
2023-04-20 | House | (H) Taken from Table in Committee (H) Appropriations |
2023-04-20 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Appropriations |
2023-04-19 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2023-04-19 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2023-04-19 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2023-04-19 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2023-04-14 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Taxation |
2023-04-14 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Taxation |
2023-04-06 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Taxation |
2023-04-03 | House | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) Taxation |
2023-03-29 | House | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) Taxation |
2023-03-25 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Taxation |
2023-03-24 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2023-03-24 | House | (H) First Reading |
2023-03-23 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2023-03-23 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2023-03-22 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Finance and Claims |
2023-03-21 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Finance and Claims |
2023-03-16 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2023-03-13 | Senate | (S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2023-03-13 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2023-03-13 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2023-02-24 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2023-02-21 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Taxation |
2023-02-21 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Taxation |
2023-02-17 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Taxation |
2023-02-10 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2023-02-09 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Signed |
2023-02-09 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2023-02-08 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2023-02-02 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2023-02-01 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2023-02-01 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Taxation |
2023-02-01 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2023-02-01 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2023-01-31 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2023-01-31 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-01-31 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2023-01-31 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-01-30 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2023-01-30 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2023-01-30 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2023-01-30 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2023-01-29 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2023-01-29 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review | |
2023-01-26 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2023-01-25 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2022-12-04 | (C) Draft Request Received |