MT SB244 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-18 - (H) 2nd Reading Not Concurred as Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-18 - (H) 2nd Reading Not Concurred as Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Establish a Montana trade center in Calgary
Title
Establish a Montana trade center in Calgary
Sponsors
Sen. Dee Brown [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-18 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Not Concurred as Amended (Y: 43 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-17 - House - (H) Taken from Committee; Placed on 2nd Reading (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-14 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-17 - House - (H) Taken from Committee; Placed on 2nd Reading (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-14 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-18 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Not Concurred as Amended |
2015-04-18 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried |
2015-04-18 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-04-17 | House | (H) Taken from Committee; Placed on 2nd Reading (H) Business and Labor |
2015-04-17 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Business and Labor |
2015-04-17 | House | (H) Taken from Table in Committee (H) Business and Labor |
2015-03-10 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Business and Labor |
2015-03-06 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Business and Labor |
2015-02-18 | House | (H) First Reading |
2015-02-18 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Business and Labor |
2015-02-16 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2015-02-16 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2015-02-16 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-02-14 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2015-02-14 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-02-12 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-02-12 | (C) Sponsors Engrossed | |
2015-02-12 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2015-02-12 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2015-02-11 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2015-02-09 | Senate | (S) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-02-06 | Senate | (S) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Signed |
2015-02-06 | Senate | (S) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Received |
2015-02-06 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-02-04 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2015-01-30 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2015-01-30 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2015-01-29 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2015-01-29 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-01-29 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2015-01-28 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2015-01-28 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2015-01-27 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2015-01-27 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2015-01-27 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2015-01-27 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2015-01-27 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2015-01-26 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2015-01-26 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2015-01-24 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2015-01-24 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2014-12-01 | (C) Draft Request Received |