MT SB239 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-27 - (S) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Protect property rights of dog owners by prohibiting breed-specific ordinances

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protect property rights of dog owners by prohibiting breed-specific ordinances

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-21 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postponed (Y: 37 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-21 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Pass Motion Failed (Y: 23 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-18 - Senate - (S) Local Government Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-27Senate(S) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
2015-02-21Senate(S) 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postponed
2015-02-21Senate(S) 2nd Reading Pass Motion Failed
2015-02-21Senate(S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2015-02-19 (C) Printed - New Version Available
2015-02-19Senate(S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Local Government
2015-02-18Senate(S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Local Government
2015-02-16Senate(S) Hearing (S) Local Government
2015-01-29 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
2015-01-29Senate(S) Referred to Committee (S) Local Government
2015-01-29Senate(S) First Reading
2015-01-29Senate(S) Introduced
2015-01-28 (C) Draft Delivered to Requester
2015-01-21 (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
2015-01-21 (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
2015-01-21 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2015-01-21 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2015-01-21 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN]
2015-01-20 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2015-01-20 (C) Draft Back for Redo
2015-01-20 (C) Draft Delivered to Requester
2015-01-16 (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
2015-01-15 (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
2015-01-15 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2015-01-15 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2015-01-15 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2015-01-14 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN]
2015-01-12 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2015-01-10 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2015-01-07 (C) Draft Taken Off Hold
2014-12-24 (C) Draft On Hold
2014-10-09 (C) Draft Request Received

Subjects


Montana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback