MT SB231 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establish Conrad Burns Memorial Highway
Title
Establish Conrad Burns Memorial Highway
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Webb [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 64 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 63 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - (H) Transportation Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - (S) Highways and Transportation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 63 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - (H) Transportation Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - (S) Highways and Transportation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2017-04-13 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2017-04-06 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2017-04-06 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-04 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2017-03-30 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2017-03-29 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2017-03-29 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2017-03-28 | House | (H) Returned to Senate |
2017-03-28 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2017-03-28 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-03-27 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2017-03-27 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-03-24 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-03-14 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-03-14 | (C) Sponsors Engrossed | |
2017-03-14 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Transportation |
2017-03-13 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Transportation |
2017-03-08 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Transportation |
2017-02-24 | House | (H) First Reading |
2017-02-24 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Transportation |
2017-02-22 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2017-02-22 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2017-02-22 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-02-21 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2017-02-21 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-02-17 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Highways and Transportation |
2017-02-16 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Highways and Transportation |
2017-02-16 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Highways and Transportation |
2017-02-15 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2017-02-15 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Signed |
2017-02-15 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2017-02-13 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2017-02-10 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Highways and Transportation |
2017-02-10 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2017-02-09 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2017-02-09 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2017-02-07 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2017-02-07 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2017-02-07 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2017-02-07 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2017-02-07 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2017-02-07 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2017-02-07 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2017-02-07 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2017-02-04 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2017-02-03 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2017-02-03 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2016-12-08 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2016-11-29 | (C) Draft Request Received |