MT SB224 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Generally revise laws related to county road access
Title
Generally revise laws related to county road access
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-09 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - (S) Highways and Transportation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - (S) Highways and Transportation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Judiciary |
2019-04-09 | House | (H) Motion Failed |
2019-04-02 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Judiciary |
2019-03-26 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Judiciary |
2019-03-12 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Judiciary |
2019-03-12 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary |
2019-03-09 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2019-03-09 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2019-03-09 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-03-08 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2019-03-08 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-02-22 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-02-22 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Highways and Transportation |
2019-02-21 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Highways and Transportation |
2019-02-19 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Highways and Transportation |
2019-02-15 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2019-02-15 | (C) Fiscal Note Unsigned | |
2019-02-13 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2019-02-07 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Highways and Transportation |
2019-02-06 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2019-02-06 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2019-02-06 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2019-02-06 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2019-02-04 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2019-02-01 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2019-02-01 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2019-01-31 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2019-01-31 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2019-01-31 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2019-01-31 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2019-01-31 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2019-01-31 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2019-01-30 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2019-01-30 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2019-01-30 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2018-12-18 | (C) Draft Request Received |