MT SB224 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Create a commission to study criminal justice system
Title
Create a commission to study criminal justice system
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-09 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-21 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-21 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2015-04-28 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2015-04-23 | Senate | (S) Returned with Governor's Line-item Veto |
2015-04-23 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2015-04-13 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2015-04-13 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2015-04-10 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2015-04-10 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2015-04-10 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2015-04-09 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2015-04-09 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House |
2015-04-09 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-04-08 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred |
2015-04-08 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-04-08 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-04-07 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Signed |
2015-04-07 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2015-04-01 | House | (H) Returned to Senate with Amendments |
2015-04-01 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-04-01 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2015-04-01 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-03-31 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-03-31 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended |
2015-03-31 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried |
2015-03-31 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-03-23 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-03-20 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2015-03-18 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-03-18 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-03-18 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Judiciary |
2015-03-17 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Judiciary |
2015-03-11 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Judiciary |
2015-02-24 | House | (H) First Reading |
2015-02-24 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary |
2015-02-21 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2015-02-21 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2015-02-21 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-02-20 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2015-02-20 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-02-20 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-02-19 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Signed |
2015-02-19 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2015-02-18 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Judiciary |
2015-02-18 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-02-17 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Judiciary |
2015-02-11 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Judiciary |
2015-02-04 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Signed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2015-01-28 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Judiciary |
2015-01-28 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2015-01-27 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2015-01-27 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-01-27 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2015-01-26 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2015-01-23 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2015-01-22 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2015-01-22 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2015-01-22 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2015-01-22 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2015-01-22 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN] | |
2015-01-21 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2015-01-21 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2015-01-21 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2015-01-20 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2015-01-15 | (C) Draft Back for Requester Changes | |
2015-01-13 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2015-01-12 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2015-01-05 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2014-12-29 | (C) Draft Request Received |