MT SB218 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Business and Labor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Business and Labor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise requirements related to reports on the medical marijuana program
Title
Revise requirements related to reports on the medical marijuana program
Sponsors
Sen. Diane Sands [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-01 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-27 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-27 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | House | (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Business and Labor |
2021-03-24 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Business and Labor |
2021-03-20 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2021-03-12 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Business and Labor |
2021-03-01 | House | (H) First Reading |
2021-03-01 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Business and Labor |
2021-03-01 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2021-03-01 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2021-03-01 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-02-27 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2021-02-27 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-02-23 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2021-02-17 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2021-02-11 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2021-02-11 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2021-02-10 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2021-02-10 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2021-02-10 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2021-02-09 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-02-09 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2021-02-09 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-02-08 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2021-02-08 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2021-02-08 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2021-02-08 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2021-02-08 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2021-02-08 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2021-02-04 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2021-02-04 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2021-02-03 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2020-12-31 | (C) Draft Request Received |