MT SB21 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-27 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-27 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Clarify standard for illegal influence of voters
Title
Clarify standard for illegal influence of voters
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Arthun [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-14 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-27 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2013-03-27 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2013-03-21 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2013-03-20 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2013-03-19 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2013-03-18 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2013-03-18 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2013-03-15 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2013-03-15 | House | (H) Returned to Senate |
2013-03-14 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2013-03-14 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-03-13 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2013-03-13 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-03-08 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) State Administration |
2013-03-08 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) State Administration |
2013-03-06 | House | (H) Hearing (H) State Administration |
2013-02-26 | House | (H) First Reading |
2013-02-25 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) State Administration |
2013-01-30 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2013-01-29 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2013-01-29 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-01-28 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2013-01-28 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-01-24 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-01-24 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Judiciary |
2013-01-23 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Judiciary |
2013-01-10 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Judiciary |
2013-01-07 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2012-12-14 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Judiciary |
2012-12-03 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2012-12-03 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2012-11-20 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2012-11-19 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2012-11-19 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2012-11-19 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2012-11-19 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2012-11-19 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2012-11-16 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2012-10-25 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2012-06-26 | (C) Draft Request Received |