MT SB201 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-20 - Chapter Number Assigned  
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-20 - Chapter Number Assigned  
Summary
Revise Crow Tribe water compact to allow change in use of escrow account
Title
Revise Crow Tribe water compact to allow change in use of escrow account
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-20 | Chapter Number Assigned   | |
2009-03-20 | (S) Signed by Governor   | |
2009-03-16 | (S) Transmitted to Governor   | |
2009-03-16 | (H) Signed by Speaker   | |
2009-03-14 | (S) Signed by President   | |
2009-03-13 | (S) Returned from Enrolling   | |
2009-03-13 | (C) Printed - New Version Available   | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Sent to Enrolling   | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Returned to Senate   | |
2009-03-12 | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred   | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading   | |
2009-03-11 | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred   | |
2009-03-11 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading   | |
2009-03-09 | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Natural Resources | |
2009-03-09 | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Natural Resources | |
2009-03-04 | (H) Hearing (H) Natural Resources | |
2009-02-10 | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Natural Resources | |
2009-02-10 | (H) First Reading   | |
2009-02-09 | (S) Transmitted to House   | |
2009-02-09 | (S) 3rd Reading Passed   | |
2009-02-09 | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading   | |
2009-02-07 | (S) 2nd Reading Passed on Voice Vote   | |
2009-02-07 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading   | |
2009-02-03 | (C) Printed - New Version Available   | |
2009-02-03 | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Natural Resources | |
2009-02-03 | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Natural Resources | |
2009-01-30 | (S) Hearing (S) Natural Resources | |
2009-01-21 | (S) Fiscal Note Printed   | |
2009-01-20 | (S) Fiscal Note Signed   | |
2009-01-20 | (S) Fiscal Note Received   | |
2009-01-12 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically   | |
2009-01-12 | (S) First Reading   | |
2009-01-12 | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Natural Resources | |
2009-01-12 | (S) Fiscal Note Requested   | |
2009-01-12 | (S) Introduced   | |
2009-01-09 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester   | |
2009-01-06 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review   | |
2009-01-06 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review   | |
2009-01-06 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically   | |
2009-01-06 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing   | |
2009-01-06 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB]   | |
2009-01-06 | (C) Draft in Edit   | |
2009-01-06 | (C) Draft in Legal Review   | |
2008-12-29 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review   | |
2008-12-22 | (C) Draft Request Received   |
Subjects
Montana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://laws.leg.mt.gov/laws09/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=201&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=SB&Z_ACTION=Find |