MT SB199 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise eligibility for resort communities and resort areas
Title
Revise eligibility for resort communities and resort areas
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Hertz [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-07 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 52 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 57 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-25 - House - (H) Local Government Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 33 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - (S) Reconsidered Previous Action; Remains in 2nd Reading Process (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postponed (Y: 33 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Pass Motion Failed (Y: 24 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-01-30 - Senate - (S) Local Government Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 57 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-25 - House - (H) Local Government Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 33 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - (S) Reconsidered Previous Action; Remains in 2nd Reading Process (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postponed (Y: 33 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Pass Motion Failed (Y: 24 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-01-30 - Senate - (S) Local Government Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2023-05-02 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2023-04-24 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2023-04-22 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2023-04-19 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2023-04-18 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2023-04-17 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2023-04-07 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2023-04-07 | House | (H) Returned to Senate |
2023-04-07 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2023-04-07 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2023-04-06 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2023-04-06 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2023-03-27 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Local Government |
2023-03-25 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Local Government |
2023-03-23 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Local Government |
2023-03-10 | House | (H) First Reading |
2023-03-10 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Local Government |
2023-02-09 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2023-02-08 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2023-02-07 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2023-02-07 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2023-02-03 | Senate | (S) Reconsidered Previous Action; Remains in 2nd Reading Process |
2023-02-02 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postponed |
2023-02-02 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Pass Motion Failed |
2023-02-02 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2023-01-31 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2023-01-31 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Local Government |
2023-01-30 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Local Government |
2023-01-30 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2023-01-25 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Local Government |
2023-01-23 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2023-01-23 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Local Government |
2023-01-20 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2023-01-19 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2023-01-19 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2023-01-17 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-01-17 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2023-01-17 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-01-16 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2023-01-16 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2023-01-16 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2023-01-16 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2023-01-16 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2023-01-14 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review | |
2023-01-12 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2023-01-12 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2023-01-12 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2022-09-14 | (C) Draft Request Received |