MT SB199 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Energy, Technology and Federal Relations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Energy, Technology and Federal Relations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit PSC from altering certain contract lengths
Title
Prohibit PSC from altering certain contract lengths
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-25 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 35 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - (S) Energy and Telecommunications Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 35 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - (S) Energy and Telecommunications Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Energy, Technology and Federal Relations |
2019-04-03 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Energy, Technology and Federal Relations |
2019-03-15 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Energy, Technology and Federal Relations |
2019-02-27 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Energy, Technology and Federal Relations |
2019-02-27 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Energy, Technology and Federal Relations |
2019-02-25 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2019-02-25 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2019-02-25 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-02-22 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2019-02-22 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-02-20 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Energy and Telecommunications |
2019-02-19 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Energy and Telecommunications |
2019-02-14 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Energy and Telecommunications |
2019-02-02 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Energy and Telecommunications |
2019-02-01 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2019-02-01 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2019-02-01 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2019-01-31 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2019-01-30 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2019-01-30 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2019-01-30 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2019-01-30 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2019-01-30 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2019-01-30 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2019-01-29 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2019-01-29 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH] | |
2019-01-28 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2019-01-28 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2019-01-28 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2018-12-04 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2018-11-09 | (C) Draft Request Received |