MT SB194 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (S) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (S) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Generally revise criminal procedure laws
Title
Generally revise criminal procedure laws
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-27 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried (Y: 27 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-27 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postponed (Y: 36 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-27 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Pass as Amended Motion Failed (Y: 21 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-23 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-27 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postponed (Y: 36 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-27 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Pass as Amended Motion Failed (Y: 21 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-23 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Senate | (S) Died in Process |
2021-03-02 | Senate | (S) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal |
2021-02-27 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postponed |
2021-02-27 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Pass as Amended Motion Failed |
2021-02-27 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried |
2021-02-27 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-02-23 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Judiciary |
2021-02-23 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Judiciary |
2021-02-23 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2021-02-19 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Judiciary |
2021-02-12 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2021-02-11 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2021-02-08 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Judiciary |
2021-02-08 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2021-02-08 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2021-02-08 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2021-02-08 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2021-02-08 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2021-01-22 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-01-22 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2021-01-22 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-01-21 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2021-01-21 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2021-01-21 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2021-01-21 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2021-01-20 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2021-01-20 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2021-01-14 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2021-01-14 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2021-01-13 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2020-12-17 | (C) Draft Request Received |