MT SB185 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - (S) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - (S) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Establish a state web page of convicted embezzlement names
Title
Establish a state web page of convicted embezzlement names
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-18 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postponed (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | Senate | (S) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal |
2015-02-18 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postponed |
2015-02-18 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Not Passed |
2015-02-18 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-02-17 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-02-17 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Signed |
2015-02-17 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2015-02-13 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-02-12 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-02-12 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Judiciary |
2015-02-12 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Judiciary |
2015-01-28 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Judiciary |
2015-01-28 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-01-28 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2015-01-20 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2015-01-20 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Judiciary |
2015-01-20 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2015-01-20 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-01-20 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2015-01-19 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2015-01-15 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2015-01-14 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2015-01-14 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2015-01-14 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2015-01-14 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2015-01-14 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2015-01-13 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK] | |
2015-01-13 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2015-01-09 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2014-12-05 | (C) Draft Request Received |