MT SB18 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-10 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-10 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revising the time frame for the calculation of the entitlement share growth rate
Title
Revising the time frame for the calculation of the entitlement share growth rate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-02 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 95 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-31 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - (H) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-13 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-12 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-08 - Senate - (S) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-31 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - (H) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-13 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-12 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-08 - Senate - (S) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2015-02-10 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2015-02-06 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2015-02-05 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2015-02-05 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-05 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2015-02-05 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2015-02-03 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2015-02-03 | House | (H) Returned to Senate |
2015-02-02 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2015-02-02 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-01-31 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2015-01-31 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-01-29 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Taxation |
2015-01-29 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Taxation |
2015-01-29 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Taxation |
2015-01-20 | House | (H) First Reading |
2015-01-20 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Taxation |
2015-01-13 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2015-01-13 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2015-01-13 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-01-12 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2015-01-12 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-01-08 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Taxation |
2015-01-08 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Taxation |
2015-01-08 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Taxation |
2015-01-05 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2014-12-12 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Taxation |
2014-11-20 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2014-11-20 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2014-11-13 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2014-10-07 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2014-09-19 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2014-09-11 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2014-09-11 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2014-09-05 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN] | |
2014-09-03 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2014-09-03 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2014-07-21 | (C) Draft Request Received |