MT SB17 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - (S) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - (S) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require admin of detention facility by sheriff, chief of police or dept of corr
Title
Require admin of detention facility by sheriff, chief of police or dept of corr
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | (S) Died in Standing Committee | |
2011-02-24 | (S) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal | |
2011-02-16 | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Judiciary | |
2011-02-10 | (S) Hearing (S) Judiciary | |
2011-01-06 | (S) Fiscal Note Printed | |
2011-01-05 | (S) Fiscal Note Signed | |
2011-01-04 | (S) Fiscal Note Received | |
2011-01-03 | (S) First Reading | |
2010-12-14 | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Judiciary | |
2010-12-09 | (S) Fiscal Note Requested | |
2010-11-29 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2010-11-29 | (S) Introduced | |
2010-11-17 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2010-11-17 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2010-11-16 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2010-11-09 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2010-11-09 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2010-11-09 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB] | |
2010-11-03 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2010-10-19 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2010-10-19 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2010-04-12 | (C) Draft Request Received |
Subjects
Montana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://laws.leg.mt.gov/laws11/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=17&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=SB&Z_ACTION=Find |
Text | https://leg.mt.gov/bills/2011/sb0099/SB0017_1.pdf |