MT SB168 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise lien laws
Title
Revise lien laws
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 80 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 84 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 80 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 84 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2021-04-22 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2021-04-13 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2021-04-12 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-07 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2021-04-01 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2021-04-01 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2021-03-30 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2021-03-30 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House |
2021-03-30 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-03-29 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-03-25 | House | (H) Returned to Senate with Amendments |
2021-03-25 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2021-03-25 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-03-24 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2021-03-24 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-03-16 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2021-03-16 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Judiciary |
2021-03-16 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Judiciary |
2021-03-12 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2021-03-11 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Judiciary |
2021-02-16 | House | (H) First Reading |
2021-02-16 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary |
2021-02-12 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2021-02-12 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2021-02-12 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-02-11 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2021-02-11 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-02-05 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Judiciary |
2021-02-05 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Judiciary |
2021-02-03 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Judiciary |
2021-01-29 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Judiciary |
2021-01-28 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2021-01-28 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2021-01-28 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2021-01-28 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2021-01-05 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-01-05 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2021-01-05 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-01-05 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2021-01-04 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2021-01-04 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2021-01-04 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2021-01-04 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2021-01-04 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2021-01-02 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2020-12-23 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2020-12-23 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2020-12-22 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2020-11-25 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2020-11-22 | (C) Draft Request Received |