MT SB167 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Generally revise laws pertaining to insurance offenses
Title
Generally revise laws pertaining to insurance offenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-22 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-21 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-21 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2017-05-19 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2017-05-17 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2017-05-10 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2017-05-04 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2017-04-28 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2017-04-27 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2017-04-24 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2017-04-22 | House | (H) Returned to Senate |
2017-04-22 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2017-04-22 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-04-21 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2017-04-21 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-03-24 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Judiciary |
2017-03-24 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Judiciary |
2017-03-21 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Judiciary |
2017-03-10 | House | (H) First Reading |
2017-03-10 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary |
2017-03-08 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2017-03-08 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2017-03-08 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-03-07 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2017-03-07 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-02-24 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2017-02-24 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2017-02-20 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2017-02-16 | Senate | (S) Taken from Table in Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2017-02-07 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2017-02-03 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2017-02-03 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2017-02-01 | Senate | (S) Hearing Canceled (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2017-01-31 | Senate | (S) Bill Not Heard at Sponsor's Request (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2017-01-30 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2017-01-30 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2017-01-27 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2017-01-27 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2017-01-27 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2017-01-26 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2016-12-30 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2016-12-30 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2016-12-29 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2016-12-29 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2016-12-29 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2016-12-29 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2016-12-28 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2016-12-28 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK] | |
2016-12-20 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2016-12-20 | (C) Draft Back for Redo | |
2016-12-12 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2016-12-01 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2016-12-01 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2016-05-04 | (C) Draft Request Received |