MT SB167 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - (S) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - (S) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Update tax haven laws
Title
Update tax haven laws
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-19 - Senate - (S) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | Senate | (S) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal |
2015-02-25 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-02-25 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-02-24 | Senate | (S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-02-19 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Taxation |
2015-02-19 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Taxation |
2015-01-27 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-01-26 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Signed |
2015-01-26 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2015-01-23 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Taxation |
2015-01-17 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2015-01-16 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Taxation |
2015-01-16 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2015-01-16 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-01-16 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2015-01-16 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2015-01-15 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2015-01-14 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2015-01-14 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2015-01-14 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2015-01-14 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2015-01-14 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN] | |
2015-01-12 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2015-01-12 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2015-01-12 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2015-01-12 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2015-01-11 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2014-12-05 | (C) Draft Request Received |