MT SB158 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (S) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (S) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Allow legislators to conceal carry handguns on state property
Title
Allow legislators to conceal carry handguns on state property
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-25 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 24 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-24 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 27 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 27 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Senate | (S) Died in Process |
2021-03-02 | Senate | (S) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal |
2021-02-25 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Failed |
2021-02-25 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-02-24 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2021-02-24 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-02-05 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Judiciary |
2021-02-05 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Judiciary |
2021-02-03 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2021-02-03 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Judiciary |
2021-01-28 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Judiciary |
2021-01-28 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2021-01-27 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2021-01-27 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2021-01-25 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2021-01-19 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-01-19 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2021-01-19 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-01-19 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2021-01-19 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2021-01-18 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2021-01-18 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2021-01-16 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2021-01-15 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2021-01-12 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2021-01-11 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2021-01-09 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2020-11-19 | (C) Draft Request Received |