MT SB143 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-13 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-13 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise state grizzly bear policy
Title
Revise state grizzly bear policy
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-28 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-18 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 72 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 72 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-18 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 72 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 72 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-13 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2011-05-04 | (S) Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-28 | (S) Transmitted to House for Consideration of Governor's Proposed Amendments | |
2011-04-28 | (S) 3rd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted | |
2011-04-28 | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading | |
2011-04-28 | (S) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted | |
2011-04-28 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-04-27 | (S) Returned with Governor's Proposed Amendments | |
2011-04-26 | (S) Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-26 | (H) Signed by Speaker | |
2011-04-25 | (S) Signed by President | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Returned from Enrolling | |
2011-04-19 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Sent to Enrolling | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Returned to Senate | |
2011-04-18 | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading | |
2011-04-13 | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred | |
2011-04-13 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-04-06 | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Agriculture | |
2011-04-05 | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Agriculture | |
2011-04-05 | (H) Taken from Table in Committee (H) Agriculture | |
2011-03-23 | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Agriculture | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Hearing (H) Agriculture | |
2011-02-11 | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Agriculture | |
2011-02-11 | (H) First Reading | |
2011-02-02 | (S) Transmitted to House | |
2011-02-02 | (S) 3rd Reading Passed | |
2011-02-02 | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading | |
2011-01-31 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2011-01-31 | (S) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended | |
2011-01-31 | (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried | |
2011-01-31 | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation | |
2011-01-25 | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation | |
2011-01-19 | (S) Fiscal Note Printed | |
2011-01-18 | (S) Hearing (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation | |
2011-01-18 | (S) Fiscal Note Received | |
2011-01-17 | (S) Fiscal Note Requested | |
2011-01-08 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2011-01-08 | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation | |
2011-01-08 | (S) First Reading | |
2011-01-08 | (S) Introduced | |
2011-01-06 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2011-01-05 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2011-01-04 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2011-01-04 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2011-01-03 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2011-01-03 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2011-01-03 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN] | |
2010-12-31 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2010-12-21 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2010-12-21 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2010-12-08 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2010-12-05 | (C) Draft Request Received |