MT SB13 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - (S) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - (S) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Revise fee for state parks on light vehicle registration to require opt-in
Title
Revise fee for state parks on light vehicle registration to require opt-in
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | (S) Died in Process | |
2011-03-30 | (S) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal | |
2011-02-24 | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed | |
2011-02-23 | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Received | |
2011-02-18 | (S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims | |
2011-02-16 | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Requested | |
2011-02-16 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2011-02-16 | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Finance and Claims | |
2011-02-15 | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Finance and Claims | |
2011-01-13 | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims | |
2011-01-12 | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed | |
2011-01-12 | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Signed | |
2011-01-11 | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Received | |
2011-01-10 | (S) Fiscal Note Printed | |
2011-01-07 | (S) Fiscal Note Signed | |
2011-01-06 | (S) Fiscal Note Received | |
2011-01-03 | (S) First Reading | |
2010-12-14 | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims | |
2010-12-09 | (S) Fiscal Note Requested | |
2010-11-24 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2010-11-24 | (S) Introduced | |
2010-11-09 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2010-11-06 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2010-11-05 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2010-11-05 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2010-11-05 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2010-11-05 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN] | |
2010-10-20 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2010-10-08 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2010-09-27 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2010-09-27 | (C) Draft Request Received |