MT SB113 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Allow evidence of other crimes in prosecution of sexual offenses
Title
Allow evidence of other crimes in prosecution of sexual offenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-01-31 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | House | (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Judiciary |
2013-03-13 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Judiciary |
2013-03-08 | House | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) Judiciary |
2013-03-07 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Judiciary |
2013-02-26 | House | (H) First Reading |
2013-02-25 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary |
2013-02-01 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2013-01-31 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2013-01-31 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-01-30 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2013-01-30 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-01-25 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-01-25 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Judiciary |
2013-01-25 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Judiciary |
2013-01-23 | Senate | (S) Sponsor List Modified |
2013-01-16 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Judiciary |
2013-01-10 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2013-01-10 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Judiciary |
2013-01-09 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2013-01-09 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2013-01-09 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2012-12-21 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2012-11-14 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2012-10-31 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2012-10-31 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2012-10-30 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2012-10-30 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2012-10-30 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN] | |
2012-10-25 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2012-10-18 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2012-09-17 | (C) Draft Request Received |