MT SB108 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-26 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-26 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Renew Montana charitable endowment tax credit
Title
Renew Montana charitable endowment tax credit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-15 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 78 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 76 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 76 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-26 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2013-04-26 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2013-04-20 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2013-04-19 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2013-04-19 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2013-04-17 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2013-04-17 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2013-04-17 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2013-04-16 | House | (H) Returned to Senate |
2013-04-15 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2013-04-15 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-04-13 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Appropriations |
2013-04-12 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Appropriations |
2013-04-12 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2013-04-09 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2013-04-09 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2013-04-09 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-03-18 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Taxation |
2013-03-18 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Taxation |
2013-03-13 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Taxation |
2013-03-08 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Taxation |
2013-03-08 | House | (H) First Reading |
2013-02-02 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2013-02-01 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2013-02-01 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-01-31 | Senate | (S) Reconsidered Previous Action; Remains in 3rd Reading Process |
2013-01-29 | Senate | (S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2013-01-29 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2013-01-29 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-01-28 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-01-24 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Taxation |
2013-01-23 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Taxation |
2013-01-18 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Taxation |
2013-01-18 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2013-01-17 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Signed |
2013-01-17 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2013-01-10 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2013-01-10 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Taxation |
2013-01-09 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2013-01-09 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2013-01-09 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2013-01-08 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2013-01-08 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2013-01-04 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2013-01-04 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2012-12-31 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2012-12-31 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2012-12-24 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB] | |
2012-12-24 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2012-12-10 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2012-12-09 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2012-12-09 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2012-12-04 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2012-11-17 | (C) Draft Request Received |