MT SB102 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Education and Cultural Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Education and Cultural Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increase maximum allowable pupil instruction days
Title
Increase maximum allowable pupil instruction days
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | Senate | (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2013-02-28 | Senate | (S) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal |
2013-01-28 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2013-01-25 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2013-01-15 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2013-01-15 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Signed |
2013-01-15 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2013-01-09 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2013-01-09 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2013-01-08 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2013-01-08 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2013-01-08 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2013-01-08 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2012-12-21 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2012-12-13 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2012-12-12 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2012-12-12 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2012-12-12 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2012-12-12 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2012-12-11 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2012-12-04 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2012-12-04 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2012-11-17 | (C) Draft Request Received |
Subjects
Montana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=102&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=SB&Z_ACTION=Find&P_SESS=20131 |
Text | https://leg.mt.gov/bills/2013/sb0199/SB0102_1.pdf |