MT SB100 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - (S) Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - (S) Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the provision of information before the performance of an abortion
Title
Requiring the provision of information before the performance of an abortion
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 58 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 59 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 11 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 59 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 11 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | (S) Vetoed by Governor |
2019-04-26 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2019-04-18 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-16 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2019-04-13 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2019-04-13 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2019-04-12 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2019-04-11 | House | (H) Returned to Senate |
2019-04-11 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2019-04-11 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-04-10 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2019-04-10 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-04-05 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Judiciary |
2019-04-05 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Judiciary |
2019-03-25 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Judiciary |
2019-02-14 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Judiciary |
2019-02-14 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary |
2019-02-12 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2019-02-12 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2019-02-12 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-02-11 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2019-02-11 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-02-06 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Judiciary |
2019-02-06 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Judiciary |
2019-02-01 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Judiciary |
2019-01-23 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2019-01-23 | (C) Fiscal Note Unsigned | |
2019-01-23 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2019-01-14 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Judiciary |
2019-01-14 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2019-01-12 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2019-01-11 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2019-01-11 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2019-01-10 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2019-01-08 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2019-01-08 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2019-01-08 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2019-01-08 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2019-01-08 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2019-01-08 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2019-01-07 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2019-01-07 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2019-01-05 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2019-01-03 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2019-01-03 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2019-01-03 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2018-11-29 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2018-11-08 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2018-10-31 | (C) Draft Request Received |