MT SB10 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-17 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-17 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal the refundable income tax credit relief multiple
Title
Repeal the refundable income tax credit relief multiple
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-09 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - Senate - (S) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - Senate - (S) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-17 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2017-02-17 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2017-02-14 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2017-02-14 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-13 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2017-02-13 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2017-02-13 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2017-02-10 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2017-02-09 | House | (H) Returned to Senate |
2017-02-09 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2017-02-09 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-02-08 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2017-02-08 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-02-06 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (H) Taxation |
2017-02-03 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (H) Taxation |
2017-02-01 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Taxation |
2017-01-25 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Taxation |
2017-01-25 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Taxation |
2017-01-24 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2017-01-24 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2017-01-24 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-01-23 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2017-01-23 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-01-12 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Taxation |
2017-01-12 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Taxation |
2017-01-10 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Taxation |
2017-01-03 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2017-01-02 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Signed |
2017-01-02 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2016-12-28 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2016-12-07 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Taxation |
2016-12-02 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2016-11-23 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2016-11-23 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2016-11-09 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2016-11-09 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2016-11-04 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2016-11-03 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2016-11-03 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2016-11-03 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2016-10-12 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2016-10-12 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH] | |
2016-10-12 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2016-10-11 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2016-10-11 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2016-10-11 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2016-09-08 | (C) Draft Request Received |