MT HJ48 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - (H) Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - (H) Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Interim study of supporting families in the child protective services system
Title
Interim study of supporting families in the child protective services system
Sponsors
Sen. Dennis Lenz [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 41 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 77 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - (H) Human Services Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 77 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - (H) Human Services Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | (H) Filed with Secretary of State |
2019-04-30 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2019-04-26 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2019-04-26 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-26 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2019-04-25 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2019-04-25 | Senate | (S) Returned to House |
2019-04-25 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2019-04-25 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2019-04-25 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-04-24 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2019-04-24 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2019-04-24 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2019-04-18 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2019-04-18 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2019-04-17 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2019-04-17 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2019-04-17 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-04-16 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2019-04-16 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-04-12 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Human Services |
2019-04-11 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Human Services |
2019-04-11 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Human Services |
2019-04-09 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2019-04-09 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Human Services |
2019-04-09 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Human Services |
2019-04-09 | House | (H) Introduced |
2019-04-09 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2019-04-06 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2019-04-05 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2019-04-05 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2019-04-05 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2019-04-05 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2019-04-05 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2019-04-05 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2019-04-05 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH] | |
2019-04-05 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2019-04-05 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2019-04-05 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2019-04-05 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2019-04-03 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2019-04-03 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2019-01-03 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2018-11-12 | (C) Draft Request Received |