MT HJ30 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - (H) Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - (H) Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study of county water and/or sewer districts
Title
Interim study of county water and/or sewer districts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-26 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - (S) Local Government Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 94 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - (H) Local Government Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - (S) Local Government Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 94 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - (H) Local Government Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | House | (H) Filed with Secretary of State |
2021-05-04 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2021-05-04 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2021-05-02 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2021-05-02 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2021-04-27 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2021-04-26 | Senate | (S) Returned to House |
2021-04-26 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2021-04-26 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-04-26 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2021-04-26 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-04-23 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Local Government |
2021-04-23 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Local Government |
2021-04-23 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Local Government |
2021-04-22 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Local Government |
2021-04-22 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2021-04-21 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2021-04-21 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-04-20 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2021-04-20 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-04-09 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Local Government |
2021-04-08 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Local Government |
2021-04-08 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Local Government |
2021-03-30 | House | (H) First Reading |
2021-03-30 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Local Government |
2021-03-29 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2021-03-29 | House | (H) Introduced |
2021-03-29 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2021-03-26 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-03-26 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2021-03-26 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-03-26 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2021-03-26 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2021-03-26 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2021-03-26 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2021-03-25 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2021-03-25 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2021-03-25 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2021-03-25 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2021-02-19 | (C) Draft Request Received |